+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 303 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1501ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 093298201-S2
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Delegates: Cox, Hamilton, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (13-Y 25-N)
- Senators: Barker, Hanger, Northam
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 093293201-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1501H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 093293201-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1501S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 092913212-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 092913212-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 7-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented and ordered printed 094117201