+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: K-12
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Printed as engrossed 23103558D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1493E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 23103558D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 17, 2023: Stricken from docket by Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2023: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2023: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2023: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor