+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective 3/21/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB149ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 12102212D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB149E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
- Assigned Local Gov sub: Charter
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102212D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2012: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor