+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0918)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 1-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (94-Y 1-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 918 (effective 7/1/96)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB149ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N)
- Passed House with amendments (85-Y 11-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Fisher agreed to
- Read third time
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Amendments by Mr. Scott agreed to
- Read third time
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Passed House (95-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 966406760-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 966406760-S1
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 966406760-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 965704760
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 1-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor