+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/11)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1486ER)
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 27, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 11105695D-S2
On February 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
- Delegates: Cox, M.K., Jones, Joannou
On February 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Northam, Houck, Wampler
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 11105628D-H1
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105628D-H1
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1486H1
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105532D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1486S1
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11105532D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 11105412D
- Introduced at the request of Governor