+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 682 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1482ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 11104691D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor