+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 11104189D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1470E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 11104189D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2011: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor