+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
On April 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB147ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 965584760-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 965584760-H1
- Read third time
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 965584760-H1
- Read second time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 2
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 964875815
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1996: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor