+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0711)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 711 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1467ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 17105257D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1467H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105257D-H1
- Read third time
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 17105257D-H1
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104748D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1467S1
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1503 (Favola)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17104748D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 17103917D
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 2017: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor