+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 21102678D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1457E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 21102678D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
January 28, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor