+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
- Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
- Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N)
- Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1455ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (69-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 7-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 17103149D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1455E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 17103149D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
April 5, 2017: Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N)
April 5, 2017: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
April 5, 2017: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N)
February 16, 2017: House amendments agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 14, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N)
February 10, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 7-N)
February 9, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
January 26, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor