+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 10/1/21)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1453ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 21101563D-E
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1453E
- Amendments by Senator Edwards agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 21101563D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 15, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2021: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor