+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 657 (effective 7/1/15)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1450ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 15105549D-S2
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Leftwich, Minchew, Herring
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Obenshain, Stuart, McEachin
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105325D-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1450H1
- Passed House with substitute (90-Y 8-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15105325D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1450S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104351D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104351D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 15104141D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 27, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2015: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
February 26, 2015: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
February 23, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
February 10, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
February 6, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor