+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 680 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1450ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Passed House with amendment (93-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 11103930D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1450E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 11103930D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 2011: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N 3-A)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor