+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 666 (effective - see bill)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB145ER)
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 022553508-S1
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Jones, S.C., Broman, Darner
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senators: Norment, Ruff, Houck
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (5-Y 33-N 1-A)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (5-Y 33-N 1-A)
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 022547508-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (97-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 022547508-H1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 022547508-H1
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Communicated to House
On February 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 022020508-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 022020508
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 9, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2002: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENT (5-Y 33-N 1-A)
February 25, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 21, 2002: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 1, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2002: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor