+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1449ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 19106630D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106630D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1449H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106630D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104069D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 20, 2019: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor