+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 164 (effective 3/16/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1449ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 097446340-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1449E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 097446340
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor