+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104784D-S2
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 15104664D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1449S2
- Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (23-Y 15-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104784D-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 15104664D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 15102132D
+ − Votes (7)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
February 10, 2015: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Passed Senate (23-Y 15-N)
February 9, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 2, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor