+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104809D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1446S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104809D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 15103422D
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor