+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 343 (effective 7/1/21)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1444ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 21200803D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Agreed To (96-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senators: Saslaw, Deeds, Suetterlein
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Delegates: Simon, Askew, Rush
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 36-N)
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 21200428D-H2 (Simon)
- Floor substitute printed 21200542D-H1 (Simon)
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB1444H1
- Substitute by Delegate Simon withdrawn 21200428D-H2
- Passed House with substitute (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Substitute by Delegate Simon agreed to 21200542D-H1
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104324D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1444S1
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Incorporates SB1377 (Suetterlein)
- Committee substitute printed 21104324D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 21103238D