+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
On April 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 444 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB144ER)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (66-Y 31-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 31-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (65-Y 33-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (65-Y 33-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (21-Y 3-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (31-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (31-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985954693-E
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985954693
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 31-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (65-Y 33-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (21-Y 3-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (31-Y 6-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor