+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 433 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1438ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 17101768D
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor