+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 098605248
+ − Votes (3)
February 19, 2009: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table
January 30, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor