+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 510 (effective 7/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1432ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 19106496D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106496D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1432H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 19106496D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101660D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 15, 2019: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2019: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor