+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB143ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 18101219D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB143E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
On December 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101219D
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2018: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor