+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 715 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1427ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103922D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2019: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2019: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor