+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1427S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103085D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103085D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 21100852D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 26, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2021: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor