+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1426ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 19103578D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1426E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103578D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor