+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 791 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1425ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
- Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed House with amendment (62-Y 34-N 2-A)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N 2-A)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1425S1
- Substitute by Senator Dunnavant agreed to 19105609D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 19105609D-S1 (Dunnavant)
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102489D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
February 19, 2019: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 19, 2019: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 19, 2019: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N 2-A)
February 13, 2019: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N)
February 6, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N)
January 24, 2019: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2019: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 18, 2019: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2019: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor