+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 705 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1420ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Energy (20-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1420S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23104668D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 23104668D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assigned C&L sub: Energy
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102041D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 17, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2023: Reported from Commerce and Energy (20-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2023: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2023: Passed by for the day in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2023: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor