+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104362D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB142S1
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104362D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
On December 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101935D
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
January 29, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor