+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1418S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104295D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21104295D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 21102436D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor