+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1417ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1417S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104526D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104526D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 15103851D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor