+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 709 (effective 7/1/17)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1417ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1417S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105080D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17105080D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 17102153D
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor