+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 631 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1415ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Education and Health Committee amendments rejected
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 23105909D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1415S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 23105909D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101946D