+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 421 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1412ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1412S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104558D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15104558D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented and ordered printed 15103135D
+ − Votes (8)
February 19, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2015: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor