+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 228 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1411ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105162D-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1411H1
- Passed House with substitute (92-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 15105162D-H1
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15105162D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 15103788D
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2015: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 1-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor