+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 9-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1410S1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104439D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 15104439D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 15103819D
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 9-N)
February 4, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Reported from Finance (13-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor