+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
On March 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1410ER)
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE(100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 013222556
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2001: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor