+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (65)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0892)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB141ER2)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 892 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB141ER)
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 4-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 4-N)
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (0-Y 38-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute with amendment
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (31-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (31-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: O'Brien, Devolites Davis, Lambert
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Jones, S.C., Hugo, Alexander
- House requested conference committee
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
- Motion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 060628784-H1
- Passed House with substitute with amendment (98-Y 0-N)
- Amendment by Delegate Marshall, R.G. agreed to (81-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 15-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB141H1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 060628784-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB141E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 066595784-E
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066595784