+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On February 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass in Senate
- No further action taken
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Leftwich, Miyares, Toscano
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators: Petersen, Obenshain, Stanley
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 19102876D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1404E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 2-N 1-A)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102876D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (9)
February 21, 2019: House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
February 21, 2019: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: Blank Action (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 2-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor