+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102080D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 1, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
January 28, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor