+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 555 (effective - see bill)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1402ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 23102885D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1402E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102885D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2023: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2023: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor