+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100971D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N)
February 3, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
February 3, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2021: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor