+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103367D-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1392ES1
- Printed as engrossed 21103367D-ES1
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 21103367D-S1
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102919D