+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
On January 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N)
On January 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101900D
+ − Votes (5)
January 26, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
January 25, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
January 25, 2010: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2010: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor