+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103860D-S1
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1389ES1
- Printed as engrossed 21103860D-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21103860D-S1
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102797D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 4, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2021: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor