+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 16-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 15103566D
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 16-N)
February 3, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor