+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- House sustained Governor's veto
- VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 37-N)
- Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (56-Y 37-N)
- 2/3 affirmative vote required for passage
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE-ENROLLED BILL (29-Y 8-N)
- Passed in enrolled form (29-Y 8-N)
On March 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1387ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 4-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Pending question, not ordered
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Kilgore agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Passed House with amendments (65-Y 31-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 31-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds (23-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 7-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 013141556
- Unanimous consent to introduce