+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
On March 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1386ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1386S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 076123820-S1
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 076123820-S1
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 071560820
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor